USA v. Bradley et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Troy Kidd, State of California, Franchise Tax Board and Richard E. Bradley
Case Number: 2:2019cv01466
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/26/19 APPROVING Lien Priority Stipulation. (Kaminski, H)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Lien Priority between the United States and Butte County by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Proposed Order)(Mejia, Christian) Modified on 9/26/2019 (Kaminski, H).
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Richard E. Bradley served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Mejia, Christian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Troy Kidd served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Mejia, Christian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: State of California, Franchise Tax Board served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Mejia, Christian)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Huang, H)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Richard E. Bradley, Troy Kidd, State of California, Franchise Tax Board* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christian Mejia* *United States Department Of Justice, Tax Division* *Post Office Box 683, Ben Franklin Station* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Huang, H)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. Attorney Mejia, Christian added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mejia, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Bradley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California, Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christian Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?