Griffin et al v. Padilla
Plaintiff: James B. Oerding, Jerry Griffin, Michelle Bolotin and Michael Sienkiewicz
Defendant: Alex Padilla
Not Classified By Court: Jeffrey S. Koenig
Case Number: 2:2019cv01477
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
2 Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, James B. Oerding, Michael Sienkiewicz for proceedings held on Sept. 19, 2019 before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Court Reporter Diane Shepard. (Nobile, T.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 19, 2019, before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr, filed by Court Reporter Diane Shepard, Phone number 916-554-7460 E-mail diane.shepard@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 10/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2019. (Shepard, D)
September 23, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER by Alex Padilla.(Russell, Jay)
September 23, 2019 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Alex Padilla for proceedings held on 9/19/2019 before Judge Hon. Morrison C. England, Jr.. Court Reporter Diane Shepard. (Chang, Peter)
September 19, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on 9/19/2019. After argument from counsel, the Court tentatively GRANTED the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #20 . A written order will be filed not later than October 1, 2019. Plaintiffs' Counsel T. Russell Nobile, present. Defendant's Counsel Jay Russell, Chad Stegeman, Peter Chang, Paul Stein, present. Court Reporter: Diane Shepard. (Deutsch, S)
September 17, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to this Court's previous Related Case Orders, civil cases 2:19-cv-1477-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01501-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01507-MCE-DB and 2:19-cv-01659-MCE-DB are hereby RELATED. (Deutsch, S)
September 12, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY by Plaintiffs in SUPPORT of #20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Nobile, T.) Modified on 9/13/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 9, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion, the September 19, 2019 hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #10 is ADVANCED to 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S)
September 5, 2019 Filing 30 OPPOSITION by Alex Padilla to #20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Chang, Peter)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/29/2019 GRANTING #28 Request by State Defendants to file a single, combined brief with an enlarged limit of 40 pages in opposition to the Motions for Preliminary Injunction. The court will also permit Reply memoranda of up to 20 pages in length. (Donati, J)
August 29, 2019 Filing 28 REQUEST to FILE Single, Combined Opposition Brief with Enlarged Page Limit of 40 pages in Opposition to Motions for Preliminary Injunction by Alex Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Peter) Modified on 8/29/2019 (Kaminski, H).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/28/19 ADDING Added Attorney H. Christopher Coates, PHV for Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, James B. Oerding and Michael Sienkiewicz. (Kastilahn, A)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/28/2019 ORDERING that cases 2:19-cv-1477 and 2:19-cv-1659 are RELATED. All cases shall be ASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Donati, J)
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01659-TLN-EFB by Alex Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chang, Peter) Modified on 8/28/2019 (Kaminski, H).
August 27, 2019 Filing 24 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, James B. Oerding, Michael Sienkiewicz for attorney H. Christopher Coates to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8430267) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sticht, Robert)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter H. Chang on behalf of Alex Padilla. Attorney Chang, Peter H. added. (Chang, Peter)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/20/19 ADDING Attorney T. Russell Nobile, PHV for Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, James B. Oerding and Michael Sienkiewicz. (Kastilahn, A)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/21/2019 ORDERING that cases 2:19-cv-1477, 2:19-cv-1501, 2:19-cv-1506, 2:19-cv-1507 and 2:19-cv-1604 are RELATED. All cases shall be ASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Donati, J)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, James B. Oerding, Michael Sienkiewicz. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Jerry Griffin, #4 Declaration of Michelle Bolotin, #5 Declaration of Michael Sienkiewicz, #6 Declaration of James B. Oerding)(Sticht, Robert)
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01604-WBS-CKD, 2:19-cv-01501-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01507-MCE-DB by Jerry Griffin. (Jensen, Paul)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/16/2019 ORDERING attorney Robert D. Popper added for Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, James B. Oerding and Michael Sienkiewicz. (Zignago, K.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, James B. Oerding, Michael Sienkiewicz for attorney T. Russell Nobile to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8412209) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sticht, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court acknowledges receipt of communication from counsel in Case No. 2:19-cv-01501 expressing concern about the time constraints presented by this matter, and requesting a joint teleconference involving counsel in all the related cases, if necessary, to address those concerns. The parties are advised that given the presently scheduled hearing date of September 19, 2019 on pending preliminary injunction motions in the related cases, the Court will issue its ruling on those motions not later than September 30, 2019. (Deutsch, S)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Under L.R. 144 Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Alex Padilla. (Stegeman, Chad) Modified on 8/15/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court is in receipt of three Motions for Preliminary Injunction in related cases 2:19-cv-01501-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB, and 2:19-cv-01507-MCE-DB. The parties are hereby advised that a joint hearing on all those motions will be held on September 19, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. Any Motion for Preliminary Injunction on the fourth and remaining case must be filed not later than August 20, 2019. Oppositions in all motions are due on September 5, 2019; replies, if any, are to be filed not later than September 12, 2019. The parties are advised to notify the Court not less than two weeks prior to the hearing how many counsel intend to appear on their behalf so that the appropriate logistical arrangements can be made. (Deutsch, S)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, James B. Oerding, Michael Sienkiewicz for attorney Robert D. Popper to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8401284) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sticht, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/9/2019 ORDERING that cases 2:19-cv-1477, 2:19-cv-1501, 2:19-cv-1506 and 2:19-cv-1507 are RELATED. All cases shall be ASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Donati, J)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by Michelle Bolotin, et al. (Sticht, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2019 (Huang, H).
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01501-TLN-AC, 2:19-at-00706, 2:19-at-00709 by Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, James B. Oerding, Michael Sienkiewicz. (Sticht, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Chad A. Stegeman on behalf of Alex Padilla. Attorney Stegeman, Chad A. added. (Stegeman, Chad)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-at-709, 2:19-at-00706, 2:19-at-00705, 2:19-cv-01501-TLN-AC by Jeffrey S. Koenig. Attorney Albert, Mark Anchor added. (Albert, Mark) Modified on 8/7/2019 (Huang, H).
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01501 TLN AC by Attorney Weir, Bryan Kipp added. (Weir, Bryan) Modified on 8/6/2019 (Becknal, R).
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Zignago, K.)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/5/2019 ORDERING that the undersigned recuses himself for this case. All pending dates before Judge Mendez are VACATED, to be reset by the judge that is reassigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. for all further proceedings. The new case number is 2:19-cv-01477-MCE-DB. (Zignago, K.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Alex Padilla served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service)(Sticht, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Alex Padilla* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert Patrick Sticht* *Judicial Watch, Inc.* *425 Third Street SW, Suite 800* *Washington, DC 20024*. (Huang, H)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Padilla by Jerry Griffin, et al. Attorney Sticht, Robert Patrick added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8387536) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sticht, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin et al v. Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Oerding
Represented By: Robert Patrick Sticht
Represented By: Robert D. Popper, PHV
Represented By: H. Christopher Coates, PHV
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Griffin
Represented By: Robert Patrick Sticht
Represented By: Robert D. Popper, PHV
Represented By: H. Christopher Coates, PHV
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Bolotin
Represented By: Robert Patrick Sticht
Represented By: Robert D. Popper, PHV
Represented By: H. Christopher Coates, PHV
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sienkiewicz
Represented By: Robert Patrick Sticht
Represented By: Robert D. Popper, PHV
Represented By: H. Christopher Coates, PHV
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Padilla
Represented By: Jay Craig Russell
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Represented By: Chad A. Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jeffrey S. Koenig
Represented By: Mark Anchor Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?