Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. et al v. Padilla et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump and Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Alex Padilla
Not Classified By Court: Jerry Griffin and Jeffrey S. Koenig
Case Number: 2:2019cv01501
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
2 Judge: Morrison C England
3 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/2/2019 GRANTING #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing the provisions of the Presidential Tax Transparency and Accountability Act to the extent they require candidates for the presidency to disclose their tax returns as a condition of appearing on California's presidential primary ballot. (Donati, J)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/1/2019 GRANTING #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing the provisions of the Presidential Tax Transparency and Accountability Act to the extent they require candidates for the presidency to disclose their tax returns as a condition of appearing on Californias presidential primary ballot. (Donati, J)
September 26, 2019 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 19, 2019, before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr, filed by Court Reporter Diane Shepard, Phone number 916-554-7460 E-mail diane.shepard@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 10/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2019. (Shepard, D)
September 19, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on 9/19/2019. After argument from counsel, the Court tentatively GRANTED the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #10 . A written order will be filed not later than October 1, 2019. Plaintiffs' Counsel Bryan Weir and Thomas McCarthy, present. Defendants' Counsel Jay Russell, Chad Stegeman, Peter Chang, Paul Stein, present. Court Reporter: Diane Shepard. (Deutsch, S)
September 17, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to this Court's previous Related Case Orders, civil cases 2:19-cv-1477-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01501-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01507-MCE-DB and 2:19-cv-01659-MCE-DB are hereby RELATED. (Deutsch, S)
September 12, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump in SUPPORT of #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 9/13/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 9, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion, the September 19, 2019 hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #10 is ADVANCED to 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S)
September 6, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Chad A. Stegeman on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Alex Padilla. Attorney Stegeman, Chad A. added. (Stegeman, Chad)
September 5, 2019 Filing 26 OPPOSITION by Xavier Becerra, Alex Padilla to #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Chang, Peter)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/29/2019 GRANTING #24 Request by State Defendants to file a single, combined brief with an enlarged limit of 40 pages in opposition to the Motions for Preliminary Injunction. The court will also permit Reply memoranda of up to 20 pages in length.(Donati, J)
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST for Leave to File Single, Combined Opposition Brief with Enlarged Page Limit of 40 pages in Opposition to Motions for Preliminary Injunction by Xavier Becerra, Alex Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Peter) Modified on 8/29/2019 (Kaminski, H).
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01659-TLN-EFB by Xavier Becerra, Alex Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chang, Peter) Modified on 8/28/2019 (Kaminski, H).
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter H. Chang on behalf of Alex Padilla and Xavier Becerra. Attorney Chang, Peter H. added. (Chang, Peter) Modified on 8/23/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/21/2019 ORDERING that cases 2:19-cv-1477, 2:19-cv-1501, 2:19-cv-1506, 2:19-cv-1507 and 2:19-cv-1604 are RELATED. All cases shall be ASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Donati, J)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01447-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01507-MCE_DB, 2:19-cv-01604-WBS-CKD by Donald J. Trump. (Jensen, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court acknowledges receipt of communication from counsel in Case No. 2:19-cv-01501 expressing concern about the time constraints presented by this matter, and requesting a joint teleconference involving counsel in all the related cases, if necessary, to address those concerns. The parties are advised that given the presently scheduled hearing date of September 19, 2019 on pending preliminary injunction motions in the related cases, the Court will issue its ruling on those motions not later than September 30, 2019. (Deutsch, S)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court is in receipt of three Motions for Preliminary Injunction in related cases 2:19-cv-01501-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB, and 2:19-cv-01507-MCE-DB. The parties are hereby advised that a joint hearing on all those motions will be held on September 19, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. Any Motion for Preliminary Injunction on the fourth and remaining case must be filed not later than August 20, 2019. Oppositions in all motions are due on September 5, 2019; replies, if any, are to be filed not later than September 12, 2019. The parties are advised to notify the Court not less than two weeks prior to the hearing how many counsel intend to appear on their behalf so that the appropriate logistical arrangements can be made. (Deutsch, S)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Xavier Becerra and Alex Padilla on 8/8/2019. (Weir, Bryan) Modified on 8/15/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/9/19 ADDING Attorney Thomas R. McCarthy, PHV for Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., and Donald J. Trump. (Kastilahn, A)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/9/19 ADDING Attorney William S. Consovoy, PHV for Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., and Donald J. Trump. (Kastilahn, A)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/9/2019 ORDERING attorney Cameron T. Norris added PHV for Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. and Donald J. Trump. (Donati, J)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Weir, Bryan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Donati, J)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/9/2019 ORDERING that cases 2:19-cv-1477, 2:19-cv-1501, 2:19-cv-1506 and 2:19-cv-1507 are RELATED. All cases shall be ASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire are no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-1501 MCE DB. All dates currently set are hereby VACATED. The Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to RENOTICE their #10 Motion before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Donati, J)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 McCarthy Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Glassner Declaration, #6 Proposed Order)(Weir, Bryan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump for attorney Cameron T. Norris to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8398213) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weir, Bryan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump for attorney William S. Consovoy to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8398202) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weir, Bryan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump for attorney Thomas R. McCarthy to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8398197) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weir, Bryan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01477-MCE-DB, 2:19-at-00706, 2:19-at-00709 by Jerry Griffin. Attorney Sticht, Robert Patrick added. (Sticht, Robert) Modified on 8/9/2019 (Huang, H).
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01477-JAM-DB, 2:19-at-00706, 2:19-at-00705, 2:19-cv-01501-TLN-AC by Jeffrey S. Koenig. Attorney Albert, Mark Anchor added. (Albert, Mark) Modified on 8/9/2019 (Huang, H).
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-1477, 2:19-at-00706 by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Weir, Bryan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, Alex Padilla* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bryan Kipp Weir* *Consovoy McCarthy PLLC* *1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste. 700* *Arlington, VA 22209*. (Benson, A.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Alex Padilla by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. Attorney Weir, Bryan Kipp added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8392849) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weir, Bryan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Alex Padilla by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. Attorney Weir, Bryan Kipp added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8392849) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weir, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. et al v. Padilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Bryan Kipp Weir
Represented By: William S. Consovoy, PHV
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy, PHV
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Kipp Weir
Represented By: William S. Consovoy, PHV
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy, PHV
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Jay Craig Russell
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Represented By: Chad A. Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Padilla
Represented By: Jay Craig Russell
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Represented By: Chad A. Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jerry Griffin
Represented By: Robert Patrick Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jeffrey S. Koenig
Represented By: Mark Anchor Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?