Koenig v. Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Koenig
Defendant: Alex Padilla and Gavin Christopher Newsom
Not Classified By Court: Jerry Griffin, Melissa Melendez, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., The Republican National Committee, The California Republican Party, Charles McDougald and Bilal Ali Essayli
Case Number: 2:2019cv01507
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Edmund F Brennan
2 Judge: Morrison C England
3 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/2/2019 GRANTING #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing the provisions of the Presidential Tax Transparency and Accountability Act to the extent they require candidates for the presidency to disclose their tax returns as a condition of appearing on California's presidential primary ballot. (Donati, J)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/1/2019 GRANTING #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing the provisions of the Presidential Tax Transparency and Accountability Act to the extent they require candidates for the presidency to disclose their tax returns as a condition of appearing on Californias presidential primary ballot. (Donati, J)
September 26, 2019 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 19, 2019, before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr, filed by Court Reporter Diane Shepard, Phone number 916-554-7460 E-mail diane.shepard@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 10/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2019. (Shepard, D)
September 19, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on 9/19/2019. After argument from counsel, the Court tentatively GRANTED the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 . A written order will be filed not later than October 1, 2019. Plaintiff's Counsel Mark Albert, present and appeared telephonically. Defendants' Counsel Jay Russell, Chad Stegeman, Peter Chang, and Paul Stein, present. Court Reporter: Diane Shepard. (Deutsch, S)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/18/19 GRANTING Mr. Albert' s request to appear and argue at the hearing on the related preliminary injunction motions telephonically.(Becknal, R)
September 18, 2019 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 9/19/2019 Motions for Preliminary Injunction hearing re #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jeffrey S. Koenig, #30 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Jeffrey S. Koenig, #28 Opposition to Motion filed by Alex Padilla, Gavin Christopher Newsom by Jeffrey S. Koenig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Albert, Mark)
September 17, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to this Court's previous Related Case Orders, civil cases 2:19-cv-1477-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01501-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01507-MCE-DB and 2:19-cv-01659-MCE-DB are hereby RELATED. (Deutsch, S)
September 12, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY by Jeffrey S. Koenig in SUPPORT of #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Albert, Mark) Modified on 9/13/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 9, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion, the September 19, 2019 hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 is ADVANCED to 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S)
September 5, 2019 Filing 28 OPPOSITION by Gavin Christopher Newsom, Alex Padilla to #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Chang, Peter)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/29/2019 GRANTING #26 Request by State Defendants to file a single, combined brief with an enlarged limit of 40 pages in opposition to the Motions for Preliminary Injunction. The court will also permit Reply memoranda of up to 20 pages in length.(Donati, J)
August 29, 2019 Filing 26 REQUEST for Leave to File Single, Combined Opposition Brief with Enlarged Page Limit of 40 pages in Opposition to Motions for Preliminary Injunction by Gavin Christopher Newsom, Alex Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Peter) Modified on 8/29/2019 (Kaminski, H).
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01659-TLN-EFB by Gavin Christopher Newsom, Alex Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chang, Peter) Modified on 8/28/2019 (Kaminski, H).
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter H. Chang on behalf of Alex Padilla and Gavin Christopher Newsom. Attorney Chang, Peter H. added. (Chang, Peter) Modified on 8/23/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/21/2019 ORDERING that cases 2:19-cv-1477, 2:19-cv-1501, 2:19-cv-1506, 2:19-cv-1507 and 2:19-cv-1604 are RELATED. All cases shall be ASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Donati, J)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01604-WBS-CKD, 2:19-cv-01477-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01501-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB by Jeffrey S. Koenig. (Jensen, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: In accordance with Plaintiff's request #19 , the Motion to Consolidate Cases #12 is hereby withdrawn, and the hearing on said Motion, which had been scheduled for September 19, 2019 at 2:00 p.m., is VACATED. (Deutsch, S)
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court acknowledges receipt of communication from counsel in Case No. 2:19-cv-01501 expressing concern about the time constraints presented by this matter, and requesting a joint teleconference involving counsel in all the related cases, if necessary, to address those concerns. The parties are advised that given the presently scheduled hearing date of September 19, 2019 on pending preliminary injunction motions in the related cases, the Court will issue its ruling on those motions not later than September 30, 2019. (Deutsch, S)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 WITHDRAWAL of #12 Motion to Consolidate filed by Jeffrey S. Koenig. (Albert, Mark)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER re #12 Motion to Consolidate. (Dhillon, Harmeet) Modified on 8/14/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs to #12 Motion to Consolidate. Attorney Dhillon, Harmeet Kaur added. (Dhillon, Harmeet) Modified on 8/14/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 JOINDER by Gavin Christopher Newsom, Alex Padilla in re #12 Motion to Consolidate filed by Jeffrey S. Koenig. Attorney Stegeman, Chad A. added. (Stegeman, Chad)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court is in receipt of three Motions for Preliminary Injunction in related cases 2:19-cv-01501-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB, and 2:19-cv-01507-MCE-DB. The parties are hereby advised that a joint hearing on all those motions will be held on September 19, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. Any Motion for Preliminary Injunction on the fourth and remaining case must be filed not later than August 20, 2019. Oppositions in all motions are due on September 5, 2019; replies, if any, are to be filed not later than September 12, 2019. The parties are advised to notify the Court not less than two weeks prior to the hearing how many counsel intend to appear on their behalf so that the appropriate logistical arrangements can be made. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Consolidation #12 is set for hearing on September 19, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7, with opposition and reply papers, if any, to be filed in accordance with the provisions of E.D. Local Rule 230(c) and (d). (Deutsch, S)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump to #12 Motion to Consolidate. Attorney Weir, Bryan Kipp added. (Weir, Bryan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of ERRATA (correcting Plaintiff name) by Jeffrey S. Koenig re #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #12 Motion to Consolidate. (Albert, Mark) Modified on 8/12/2019 (Donati, J).
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES 2:19-cv-01507-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01477-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01501-MCE-D; and 2:19-cv-01506-MCE-DB by Jeffrey S. Koenig. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Albert, Mark) Modified on 8/12/2019 (Donati, J).
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Jeffrey S. Koenig. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Albert, Mark) Modified on 8/12/2019 (Donati, J).
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Jeffrey S. Koenig on 8/9/2019, Answer due 10/8/2019 (Albert, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Donati, J)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/9/2019 ORDERING that cases 2:19-cv-1477, 2:19-cv-1501, 2:19-cv-1506 and 2:19-cv-1507 are RELATED. All cases shall be ASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan are no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-1507 MCE DB. All dates currently set are hereby VACATED.(Donati, J)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01477-MCE-DB, 2:19-cv-01501-TLN-AC, 2:19-cv-01506-WBS-CKD by Jerry Griffin.(Sticht, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2019 (Benson, A.).
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Gavin Christopher Newsom, Alex Padilla* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark Anchor Albert* *800 W. 6th Street* *Suite 1220* *Los Angeles, CA 90027*. (Coll, A)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 [DISREGARD - SEE #7 NOTICE] NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01477-JAM-DB, 2:19-cv-01501-TLN-AC, 2:19-at-00706 by Jerry Griffin. Attorney Sticht, Robert Patrick added. (Sticht, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2019 (Benson, A.).
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01477-JAM-DB, 2:19-at-00706, 2:19-at-00705, 2:19-cv-01501-TLN-AC by Jeffrey S. Koenig. (Albert, Mark)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jeffrey S. Koenig (Albert, Mark)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jeffrey S. Koenig. Attorney Albert, Mark Anchor added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8394385) (Albert, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koenig v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jerry Griffin
Represented By: Robert Patrick Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Melissa Melendez
Represented By: Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Bryan Kipp Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Kipp Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: The Republican National Committee
Represented By: Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: The California Republican Party
Represented By: Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Charles McDougald
Represented By: Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Bilal Ali Essayli
Represented By: Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Koenig
Represented By: Mark Anchor Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Padilla
Represented By: Chad A. Stegeman
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Christopher Newsom
Represented By: Chad A. Stegeman
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?