Camargo-Duarte v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Jose Camargo-Duarte
Defendant: Amandeep Singh, Fast Freight Trans, Inc., Mansot Singh and Gurpreet Singh
Case Number: 2:2019cv01516
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mansot Singh served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Treyzon, Boris)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Amandeep Singh served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Fast Freight Trans, Inc., Amandeep Singh, Gurpreet Singh, Mansot Singh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Boris Treyzon* *Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo, LLP* *16001 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 200* *Encino, CA 91436*. (Benson, A.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jose Camargo-Duarte (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fast Freight Trans, Inc., Amandeep Singh, Gurpreet Singh, Mansot Singh by Jose Camargo-Duarte. Attorney Treyzon, Boris added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8396662) (Treyzon, Boris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camargo-Duarte v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amandeep Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Freight Trans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mansot Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurpreet Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Camargo-Duarte
Represented By: Boris Treyzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?