Sanchez v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Crystal R. Sanchez
Defendant: Albee, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department and County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2019cv01545
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the October 31, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Strike #8 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to STRIKE Affirmative Defenses from Defendants' Answer to Complaint by Crystal R. Sanchez. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Merin, Mark)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Albee, County of Sacramento, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department. Attorney Whitefleet, John Robert added.(Whitefleet, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Albee served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Merin, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Merin, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Sacramento served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Merin, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Albee, County of Sacramento, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark E. Merin* *1010 F Street* *Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Coll, A)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albee, County of Sacramento, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department by Crystal R. Sanchez. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8401639) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merin, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal R. Sanchez
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albee
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?