Greer v. Bens Barketplace, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kaylee Greer
Defendant: Bens Barketplace Roseville, Inc., Bens Barketplace, Inc. and Brad Romero
Case Number: 2:2019cv01563
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/4/2019 GRANTING #7 Stipulaton for Referral to VDRP. The Scheduling Conference is reset for 1/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 1/7/2020 in accordance with the Court's order issued August 13, 2019 #3 . cc: VDRP Admin. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re #7 Stipulation re Referral to VDRP by Kaylee Greer. (Peterson, Glenn) Modified on 10/2/2019 (York, M).
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to ELECT REFERRAL to VDRP by Bens Barketplace, Inc. Attorney Mackey, Stephen J. added. (Mackey, Stephen) Modified on 9/19/2019 (Huang, H).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/27/2019 ORDERING attorney Edward C. Greenberg added for Kaylee Greer. (Zignago, K.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 CORRECTED #4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Kaylee Greer for attorney Edward C. Greenberg to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Peterson, Glenn) (see #4 for payment) Modified on 8/27/2019 (Benson, A.).
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Kaylee Greer for attorney Edward C. Greenberg to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8428178) (Peterson, Glenn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bens Barketplace Roseville, Inc., Bens Barketplace, Inc., Brad Romero* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Glenn W. Peterson* *2267 Lava Ridge Court* *Suite 210* *Roseville, CA 95661*. (Coll, A)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bens Barketplace, Inc., Bens Barketplace Roseville, Inc., Brad Romero by Kaylee Greer . Attorney Peterson, Glenn W. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8404489) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. Bens Barketplace, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bens Barketplace Roseville, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bens Barketplace, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylee Greer
Represented By: Glenn W. Peterson
Represented By: Edward C. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?