(HC) Viera v. Peery
Petitioner: Daniel Hector Viera
Respondent: Suzanne M. Perry and Suzanne M. Peery
Case Number: 2:2019cv01573
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Suzanne M. Perry. Attorney Thayer, Jill M. added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Thayer, Jill)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami M. Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/16/2019. Consent or Decline due by 9/19/2019. (cc: Tami M. Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/16/2019 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of service of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami M. Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Daniel Hector Viera. (Beles, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Coll, A)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Suzanne M. Perry by Daniel Hector Viera. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0972-8405640) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beles, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Viera v. Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Suzanne M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Suzanne M. Peery
Represented By: Jill M. Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Hector Viera
Represented By: Robert Joseph Beles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?