(PS) Miner v. Kings County Housing
Plaintiff: Madiha Miner
Defendant: Kings County Housing
Case Number: 2:2019cv01622
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order to Show Cause and #6 Order served on Madiha Miner. (Huang, H)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/21/2019 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 14 days of this order, why this action should not be dismissed with prejudice based on plaintiff's failure to comply with the court's order and failure to prosecute this case. Within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint. Failure to timely comply with the terms of this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Huang, H)
September 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, served on Madiha Miner. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/12/19 GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is DISMISSED; Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of the FRCP, and the Local Rules of Practice. Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment #4 is DENIED without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 23, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Becknal, R)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for JUDGMENT by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Streeter, J).
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for CEASE and DESIST ORDER by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Streeter, J).
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kings County Housing by Madiha Miner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Miner v. Kings County Housing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madiha Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County Housing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?