(PC) Head v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Charles Head
Defendant: County of Sacramento and Kenneth Shelton
Case Number: 2:2019cv01663
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Screening of Plaintiff's Complaint; WAIVER of Reply; and Request for Jury Trial by County of Sacramento. Attorney Longyear, Dayton Van Vranken added. (Longyear, Dayton)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF of SERVICE by Charles Head re #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM by Charles Head. (Coll, A)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for SERVICE DOCUMENTS by Charles Head. (Coll, A)(Response sent: "The court will issue an order regarding service of process in due course.") Modified on 9/18/2019 (Plummer, M).
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for WAIVER of Local Rules by Charles Head. (Huang, H)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Charles Head. (Huang, H)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for SUBPOENAS by Charles Head. (Huang, H)
August 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Charles Head. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Charles Head. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration)(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Charles Head. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Charles Head re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against County of Sacramento, Kenneth Shelton by Charles Head.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Head v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?