Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC v. Boiling Seafood Corporation
Plaintiff: Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC
Defendant: Boiling Seafood Corporation and d
Case Number: 2:2019cv01787
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Boiling Seafood Corporation served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Klein, Steven)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jie M Guan Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven E. Klein, PHV* *Davis Wright Tremaine LLP* *1300 S.W. Fifth Ave, Suite 2400* *Portland, OR 97201*. (Kastilahn, A)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boiling Seafood Corporation, Jie M Guan Inc. by Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Klein, Steven)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/18/2019 GRANTING #4 Application as to Attorney Steven E. Klein, PHV to represent Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC. (York, M)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC for attorney Steven E. Klein to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-8467666) (Freed, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 3,256,219 * * 06/26/07 * * Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC * Trademark #2:* 4,174,077 * * 07/17/12 * * Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC * Trademark #3:* 4,491,054 * * 03/04/14 * * Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC * Trademark #4:* 5,374,534 * * 01/09/18 * * Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 Trademark Report, #4 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Boiling Seafood Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John D. Freed* *Davis Wright Tremaine LLP* *505 Montgomery St., Suite 800* *San Francisco, CA 94111*. (Zignago, K.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boiling Seafood Corporation by Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC. Attorney Freed, John D. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8450016) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freed, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC v. Boiling Seafood Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boiling Seafood Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: d
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boiling Crab Franchise Co., LLC
Represented By: John D. Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?