(HC) Murphy v. People of the State of California
Petitioner: Tyrone Murphy
Respondent: People of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2019cv01808
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tyrone Murphy. (Benson, A.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/19/2019. Consent or Decline due by 10/24/2019. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
September 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Tyrone Murphy. (Henshaw, R)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/18/2019 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
September 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Tyrone Murphy. (Gonzalez, R)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Gonzalez, R)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-05458.
September 10, 2019 Transferring case electronically to the Eastern District of California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/11/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Letter dated 9/4/19 from Tyrone Murphy. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/11/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tyrone Murphy.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/11/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 34611144548. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/11/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Eastern District of CA.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/6/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/11/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/11/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/7/2019. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/11/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Tyrone Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Murphy v. People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrone Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?