Thurston v. City of Vallejo et al
Plaintiff: Delon Thurston
Defendant: Heather Lamb, Kevin Barreto, City of Vallejo and Andrew Bidou
Case Number: 2:2019cv01902
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to File Responsive Pleading by Kevin Barreto, et al. Attorney Knight, Katelyn added. (Knight, Katelyn) Modified on 10/30/2019 (Huang, H).
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants served on 10/9/2019. (Pointer, Adante) Modified on 10/17/2019 (Coll, A).
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Adante Pointer on behalf of Delon Thurston. Attorney Pointer, Adante added. (Pointer, Adante)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kevin Barreto, Andrew Bidou, City of Vallejo, Heather Lamb* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Melissa Catherine Nold* *Law Office of John Burris* *7677 Oakport St.* *Oakland, CA 94621*. (Kastilahn, A)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Delon Thurston. Attorney Nold, Melissa Catherine added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8469092)(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nold, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurston v. City of Vallejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Lamb
Represented By: Katelyn Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Barreto
Represented By: Katelyn Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Represented By: Katelyn Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bidou
Represented By: Katelyn Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delon Thurston
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?