(PC) Billy Lee Eakins v. Ralph Diaz, et al
Plaintiff: Billy Lee Eakins
Defendant: Ralph Diaz and Kathleen Allison
Case Number: 2:2019cv02013
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Billy Lee Eakins. (Coll, A)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-2013-WBS-EFB (PC). (Coll, A)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Billy Lee Eakins. (Coll, A)
October 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Billy Lee Eakins. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-05470.
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/2/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019) [Transferred from cand on 10/4/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case Reassignment Order signed CLERK on 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 10/4/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 10/4/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Billy Lee Eakins.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) [Transferred from cand on 10/4/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 10/4/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy Lee Eakins. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #1 statement) (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 10/4/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ralph Diaz. Filed by Billy Lee Eakins. Consent/Declination due by 9/30/2019. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 10/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Billy Lee Eakins v. Ralph Diaz, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Lee Eakins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?