(PC) Singh v. Nicolas
Plaintiff: Baljit Singh
Defendant: Aguilera Nicolas
Case Number: 2:2019cv02048
Filed: October 12, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Baljit Singh. (Kaminski, H)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTENT TO WAIVE SERVICE by defendant(s) Aguilera Nicolas. AG Waiver of Service due in 30 days. (Kaminski, H)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Aguilera Nicolas* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Baljit Singh AH-1043* *MULE CREEK STATE PRISON* *PO BOX 409089* *IONE, CA 95640*. (Henshaw, R)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/24/2019. Consent or Decline due by 11/29/2019. (Henshaw, R)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/24/2019 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Baljit Singh. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/24/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendant: *Dr. Aguilera Nicolas, aka Dr. Nicolas Aguilera*. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver, Order re Consent, and this Order served via email on CDCR. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Attachments: #1 CDCR Notice of Waiver) (Henshaw, R)
October 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order and #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Baljit Singh. (Henshaw, R)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Baljit Singh. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 16, 2019 CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Baljit Singh, CDCR# AH-1043 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/12/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A)
October 15, 2019 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Baljit Singh. (Tupolo, A)
October 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Baljit Singh. (Tupolo, A)
October 12, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Aguilera Nicolas by Baljit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Singh v. Nicolas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baljit Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aguilera Nicolas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?