(HC) Clyde v. Spearman
Petitioner: Timothy S. Clyde
Respondent: Marion E. Spearman
Case Number: 2:2019cv02070
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Timothy S. Clyde. (Jessen, A)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-06451.
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019) [Transferred from cand on 10/16/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Timothy S. Clyde. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) [Transferred from cand on 10/16/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Timothy S. Clyde. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #1 Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 10/16/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (no process) against Marion E. Spearman, Warden, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 10/8/2019). Filed by Timothy S. Clyde. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) [Transferred from cand on 10/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Clyde v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marion E. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy S. Clyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?