(PC) Martin v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: O.Z. Martin and O. Z. Martin
Defendant: Joseph Bick, J. Lewis, Michele Ditomas, David W. Horch, Ognjen Petras, Narinder Saukhla, Robert Fox and Bethleham Haile
Case Number: 2:2019cv02075
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of consents to the dismissal of defendants Fox and Bick without prejudice by O. Z. Martin. (Reader, L)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Order directing prisoner payment #8 re-served on CDC Director and Financial. (Plummer, M)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #4 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of O.Z. Martin signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/02/19. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M) (Plummer, M).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/02/19 GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be collected in accordance with the court's CDC order filed concurrently herewith. Claims against defendants Fox and Bick are dismissed with leave to amend. Within 30 days of service of this order, plaintiff may amend his complaint to attempt to state cognizable claims against these defendants. Plaintiff is not obliged to amend his complaint. The allegations in the pleading are sufficient to state a potentially cognizable claim against defendants Petras, Haile, Saukhla, Ditomas, Horch and Lewis. If plaintiff opts to proceed on his original complaint as to these defendants, he shall return the attached notice within thirty days of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on O. Z. Martin. (Plummer, M)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, served on O. Z. Martin. (Plummer, M)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to #5 Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-02075 TLN KJN. (Kaminski, H)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on O. Z. Martin. (Kaminski, H)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by O. Z. Martin. (Kaminski, H)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by O.Z. Martin. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/16/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for ENLARGEMENT of PAGES re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint by O.Z. Martin. (Tupolo, A)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Joseph Bick, Michele Ditomas, Robert Fox, Bethleham Haile, David W. Horch, J. Lewis, Ognjen Petras, Narinder Saukhla by O.Z. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on O.Z. Martin. (Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Martin v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Ditomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Horch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ognjen Petras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narinder Saukhla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethleham Haile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.Z. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. Z. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?