Carranza v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Maricela Carranza
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation and National Railroad Passenger Corporation Doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 2:2019cv02119
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Attorney Offill-Klein, Alexei N. added.(Offill-Klein, Alexei)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: National Railroad Passenger Corporation served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Kershaw, William)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *National Railroad Passenger Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William A. Kershaw* *Kershaw, Cook & Talley PC* *401 Watt Avenue* *Sacramento, CA 95864*. (Tupolo, A)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corporation by Maricela Carranza. Attorney Kershaw, William A. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8523831) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kershaw, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carranza v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricela Carranza
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Schaff
Represented By: William A. Kershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Alexei N. Offill-Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation Doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Alexei N. Offill-Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?