(PC)Hernandez v. Constable et al
Plaintiff: Cesar N. Hernandez
Defendant: A. Constable, J. Serwanga and S. Sharma
Case Number: 2:2019cv02195
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/11/2019 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Cesar N. Hernandez. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/11/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING #1 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of service of this order. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order, #9 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, and prisoner complaint form served on Cesar N. Hernandez. (Henshaw, R)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to #6 Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-02195 MCE DB. (Kaminski, H)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Cesar N. Hernandez. (Kaminski, H)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cesar N. Hernandez. (Kaminski, H)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Cesar N. Hernandez (Tupolo, A)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Cesar N. Hernandez, CDC F-71763 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/31/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 12/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Reader, L)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Cesar N. Hernandez. (Reader, L)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Cesar N. Hernandez. (Reader, L)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against A. Constable, J. Serwanga, S. Sharma by Cesar N. Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Hernandez v. Constable et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Constable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Serwanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar N. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?