(PC) Vaden v. Mayes et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Lee Vaden
Defendant: C. McPherson, Dr. Robert L. Mayes, Marcus Smith, Primm, N. Largoza, M. Kuersten, Blackwell, Maverick Collins, Robert Neuschmid and L. Majorado
Case Number: 2:2019cv02216
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ernest Lee Vaden. (Tupolo, A)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Ernest Lee Vaden (Tupolo, A)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Ernest Lee Vaden, CDC T-65341 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-06449.
November 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ernest Lee Vaden. (Marrujo, C)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/25/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2019: #1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ernest Lee Vaden, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019) [Transferred from cand on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Ernest Lee Vaden, Jr.. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) [Transferred from cand on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Received Document: Inmate/Parolee Request for Interview, Item or Service filed by Ernest Lee Vaden, Jr.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) [Transferred from cand on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/15/2019. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) [Transferred from cand on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 (Unsigned) Prisoner's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ernest Lee Vaden, Jr.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) [Transferred from cand on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Court to Assign Petitioner an Early/Immediate Appointment of Counsel in the Interest of Justice filed by Ernest Lee Vaden, Jr.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) [Transferred from cand on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1983) (no process) against Lt. Blackwell, Maverick Collins, M. Kuersten, N. Largoza, L. Majorado, Robert L. Mayes, C. McPherson, Robert Neuschmid, Sgt. Primm, and Marcus Smith, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 10/8/2019). Filed byErnest Lee Vaden, Jr.. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) [Transferred from cand on 11/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Vaden v. Mayes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robert L. Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Largoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Kuersten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maverick Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Neuschmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Majorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Lee Vaden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?