(BK) In Re: Tarajit & Rajpal Chatha
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Appellant: Simranjit Chatha
Debtor: Taranjit Kaur Chatha and Rajpal Singh Chatha
Appellee: Douglas Whatley
Case Number: 2:2019cv02341
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Simranjit Chatha. [INITIALLY FILED IN THE BK COURT] (Donati, J)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of incomplete or delayed record, re #2 Bankruptcy New Case Documents for KJM. (Reader, L)
November 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Reassigning Case served on Simranjit Chatha. (Coll, A)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/25/19 DEEMING actions 2:19-cv-2129 WBS and 2:19-cv-2341 KJM to be RELATED; REASSIGNING Case 2:19-cv-2341 KJM to Senior Judge William B. Shubb for all further proceedings; and VACATING any dates currently set in the reassigned case. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-2341 WBS. (Coll, A)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Douglas Whatley re #3 Notice of Related Case(s). (Hughes, Christopher)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-CV-02129-WBS by Douglas Whatley. (Hughes, Christopher)
November 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Bankruptcy New Case Documents for KJM, served on Simranjit Chatha. (Donati, J)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 OPENING LETTER in BANKRUPTCY APPEAL in re Debtor: *Rajpal & Taranjit Chatha*, Appellant: *Simranjit Chatha*, Appellee: *Douglas Whatley*, USBC #: *17-25335-B-7*, ADV #: *18-2102-B*, BAP #: *EC-19-1264*, Bankruptcy Judge: *Jaime*; (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Donati, J)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, Bankruptcy Court case number 17-25335, AP # 18-2102, BAP # EC-19-1264 by Simranjit Chatha. 30-Day Filing Deadline for Bankruptcy Certificate of Record due by 12/23/2019.(Donati, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (BK) In Re: Tarajit & Rajpal Chatha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Simranjit Chatha
Represented By: Richard John Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Taranjit Kaur Chatha
Represented By: William Steven Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Rajpal Singh Chatha
Represented By: William Steven Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Douglas Whatley
Represented By: Christopher D. Hughes
Represented By: Gregory Joseph Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?