(PS) Ashford v. Yee et al
Plaintiff: Burk N. Ashford
Defendant: Betty T. Yee, Comerica Bank & Trust National Association, State Controller for State of California, Comerica Incorporated and Comerica Securities Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02358
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to the Court re: Payment by the Social Security Administration by Burk N. Ashford. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Clerk's Notice served on Burk N. Ashford. (Donati, J)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE: Ashford v. Yee was transferred in from the Northern District of Texas. The Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis was granted in TXND but the case was not screened. (See #6 Order). No documents will issue in the Eastern District of California pending screening of the complaint. The case number on all future filed documents shall be: 2:19-cv-2358 KJM EFB (PS). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-02665.
November 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Tue Nov 12 08:57:19 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 11/21/2019.]
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Eastern District of California. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/12/2019) (mcrd) [Transferred from txnd on 11/21/2019.]
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the plaintiff's #4 Application to Proceed In District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/12/2019) (mcrd) [Transferred from txnd on 11/21/2019.]
November 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Fri Nov 8 16:49:20 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 11/21/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Burk N Ashford. (cdt) [Transferred from txnd on 11/21/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Burk N Ashford. (cdt) [Transferred from txnd on 11/21/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Comerica Bank & Trust National Association, Comerica Incorporated, Comerica Securities Inc, Does 1-20, State Controller for State of California, Betty T Yee filed by Burk N Ashford. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cdt) [Transferred from txnd on 11/21/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (cdt) [Transferred from txnd on 11/21/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) [Transferred from txnd on 11/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Ashford v. Yee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty T. Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Bank & Trust National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Controller for State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Securities Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burk N. Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?