Sunteck Transport Company, LLC v. TCSL, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sunteck Transport Company, LLC
Defendant: TCSL, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02364
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sunteck Transport Company, LLC served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Crowder, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *TCSL, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert Schiller Crowder* *Tressler LLP* *6100 Center Drive, Suite 1175* *Los Angeles, CA 90045*. (Tupolo, A)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TCSL, Inc. by Sunteck Transport Company, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8584724) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crowder, Robert) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunteck Transport Company, LLC v. TCSL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCSL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunteck Transport Company, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Suzanne Perdigao
Represented By: Robert Schiller Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?