(HC) Roberson-Anderson v. Clark
Petitioner: Anthony Devon Roberson-Anderson
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus and Ken Clark
Case Number: 2:2019cv02399
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/5/2019. Consent or Decline due by 1/9/2020. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/5/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDERING Clerk to change the case caption of the docket to name Ken Clark, Warden, as the respondent; and DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
December 5, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Anthony Devon Roberson-Anderson. (Henshaw, R)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Flores, E)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/26/2019. New Case Number 2:19-cv-2399 AC. (Flores, E)
November 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Order served on Anthony Devon Roberson-Anderson. (Flores, E)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anthony Devon Roberson-Anderson. (Flores, E)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Anthony Devon Roberson-Anderson.(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Roberson-Anderson v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Devon Roberson-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?