Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission et al v. Becerra
Plaintiff: Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission, Louisiana Landowners Association, Inc. and Delacroix Corporation
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Intervenor Defendant: Humane Society of the United States, Center for Biological Diversity and Humane Society International
Case Number: 2:2019cv02488
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to INTERVENE by Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. Attorney Sivas, Deborah Ann added. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Declaration Declaration of Brendan Cummings in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Declaration Declaration of Teresa M. Telecky, Ph. D. in Support of Motion to Intervene, #4 Proposed Answer in Intervention of Defendant Intervenors to Plaintiffs Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant-Intervenors Motion to Intervene)(Sivas, Deborah)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/31/2019 GRANTING #15 Application as to Attorney Shae McPhee, PHV, to represent Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission. (York, M)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/31/2019 GRANTING #13 Application as to Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill, PHV, to represent Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission. (York, M)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/31/2019. Added attorney Joseph Scott St. John, PHV for Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission. (Huang, H)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/31/19. Added attorney Melinda Benge Brown, PHV for Delacroix Corporation. (Benson, A.)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/31/2019. Added attorney Jordan Call, PHV for Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission. (Huang, H)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/31/19. Added attorney Jeffrey Harris, PHV for Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission. (Benson, A.)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/22/2019 GRANTING Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendant Xavier Becerra, together with his successors, agents, employees, representatives, and other persons under his supervision, are ENJOINED from enforcing CA Penal Code Sections 653o and 653r with respect to any dead body, or any part or product thereof, of any crocodile or alligator. This Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in force until 30 days after any entry of any full or partial denial of Plaintiffs' motions for a preliminary injunction or a final judgment adverse to Plaintiffs, whichever comes first. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for briefing and hearing according to the following schedule: Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 3/13/2020. Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 4/10/2020. Hearing on #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction SET for 4/24/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Defendants' obligation to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint shall be stayed until 21 days after the Court's decision on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. All discovery-including but not limited to the initial scheduling conference shall be STAYED until after the Court's decision on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs are not required to post a bond. (York, M)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Delacroix Corporation for attorney Melinda Brown to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Weir, Bryan Kipp added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8635893) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weir, Bryan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission for attorney Shae McPhee to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8635867) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weir, Bryan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission for attorney Joseph Scott St. John to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8635862) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weir, Bryan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission for attorney Elizabeth Murrill to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8635851) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weir, Bryan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Re: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Xavier Becerra. Attorney Killeen, John William added. (Killeen, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra served on 12/18/19. (Weir, Bryan) Modified on 12/19/2019 (Kaminski, H).
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/17/19 RELATING cases 2:19-cv-02488-KJM-CKD and 2:19-cv-02471-KJM-CKD. (Coll, A)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER CHECKLIST by Delacroix Corporation, Louisiana Landowners Association, Inc., Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission re #2 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING. (Weir, Bryan) Modified on 12/13/2019 (Kaminski, H).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/13/2019: Pursuant to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. pending move to Senior Judge Status, this CASE is REASSIGNED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller for all further proceedings. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr no longer assigned to case. All dates currently set are VACATED, the parties are DIRECTED to obtain new dates before Judge Mueller. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-2488 KJM CKD. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bryan Kipp Weir* *Consovoy McCarthy PLL* *1600 Wilson Blvd. Suite 700* *Arlington, VA 22209*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission for attorney Jordan Call to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8618890) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weir, Bryan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission for attorney Jeffrey M. Harris to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8618887) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weir, Bryan) Modified on 12/13/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-cv-2471 by Delacroix Corporation, Louisiana Landowners Association, Inc., Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission. (Weir, Bryan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Delacroix Corporation, Louisiana Landowners Association, Inc. Motion Hearing SET for 1/9/2020 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Benge Declaration, #3 Baker Declaration, #4 Sparks Declaration, #5 St. John Declaration, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Proposed Order for TRO, #14 Proposed Order for Scheduling)(Weir, Bryan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra by Louisiana Landowners Association, Inc., Delacroix Corporation, Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission. Attorney Weir, Bryan Kipp added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8618798) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Weir, Bryan) Modified on 12/13/2019

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission et al v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: John William Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Wildlife and Fisheries Commission
Represented By: Bryan Kipp Weir
Represented By: Jeffrey Harris, PHV
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill, PHV
Represented By: Jordan Call, PHV
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John, PHV
Represented By: Shae McPhee, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Landowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delacroix Corporation
Represented By: Melinda Benge Brown
Represented By: Bryan Kipp Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Humane Society International
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?