National Electrical Manufacturers Assoc. et al v. CA Energy Commission et al
Plaintiff: American Lighting Association and National Electrical Manufacturers Association
Defendant: California Energy Commission, Karen Douglas, J. Andrew McAllister, Janea A. Scott, Patty Monahan and David Hochschild
Case Number: 2:2019cv02504
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: This action is DISMISSED, without prejudice, as provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal (ECF No. #27 ). Accordingly, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED, and this case is CLOSED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 14, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal signed by all parties by American Lighting Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association. (Gonzales, Michelle)
January 9, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER by all Defendants. Attorney Goldman, Matthew J. added.(Goldman, Matthew) Modified on 1/10/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/31/19 DENYING #11 Motion for TRO. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 27, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTES for TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/27/2019. Plaintiffs' Counsel, Sean Marotta and Nathaniel Nesbitt, present. Defendants' Counsel, Matthew Goldman, present. Also present with defense counsel: Carcie Houck, Chief Counsel for the Energy Commision; Michael Murza and Lisa DeCarlo, Staff Counsel; and Patrick Saxton, Senior Electrical Engineer. After hearing oral argument as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #11 ), the court took the motion under submission. A written order will issue. Court Reporter: Tiphanne Crowe. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mona B. served on 12/19/2019. (Nesbitt, Nathaniel) Modified on 12/30/2019 (Coll, A).
December 26, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Energy Commission served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Nesbitt, Nathaniel)
December 26, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Janea A. Scott served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Nesbitt, Nathaniel)
December 26, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: J. Andrew McAllister served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Nesbitt, Nathaniel)
December 26, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Patty Monahan served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Nesbitt, Nathaniel)
December 26, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: David Hochschild served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Nesbitt, Nathaniel)
December 26, 2019 Filing 17 [DISREGARD - WRONG DOCUMENT] SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Karen Douglas served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Nesbitt, Nathaniel) Modified on 12/26/2019 (Coll, A).
December 26, 2019 Filing 16 OPPOSITION by California Energy Commission to #11 Motion for TRO. Attorney Goldman, Matthew J. added. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit)(Goldman, Matthew) Modified on 12/27/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Telephonic Hearing re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #11 ) set for 12/27/2019 at 9:00 AM is RESET on the same date for 10:00 AM before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Minute Order on Defendants. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Of Compliance With Court Order 12 by American Lighting Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gonzales, Michelle) Modified on 12/26/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 [DISREGARD - COUNSEL TO REFILE WITH ATTACHMENT] NOTICE of COMPLIANCE with Court Order< by American Lighting Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association re 12 Minute Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gonzales, Michelle) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Benson, A.).
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. ECF No. #11 . Plaintiffs shall immediately notify defendants that they may file any opposition to the motion no later than noon on 12/26/2019; Plaintiffs shall provide notice to the court that they have fulfilled this directive. Additionally, a Telephonic Hearing is SET for 12/27/2019 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Conference call instructions will be emailed Plaintiffs' Counsel, Attorney Michelle Gonzales. Ms. Gonzales shall provide conference call instructions to defense counsel. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by American Lighting Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit, #2 Points and Authorities; (1) Temporary Restraining Order and (2) Order to Show Cause, #3 TRO Checklist, #4 Declaration of John Strainic (Redacted), #5 Declaration of David A. Gatto (Redacted), #6 Declaration of Jennifer R. Dolin (Redacted), #7 Declaration of Gregory Page (Redacted), #8 Declaration of Sean Marotta, #9 Declaration of Michael Weems, #10 Declaration of Clark Silcox, #11 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, #12 Proposed Order)(Gonzales, Michelle) Modified on 12/26/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by American Lighting Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association. (Gonzales, Michelle)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/19/19. Added attorney Sean M. Marotta, PHV for American Lighting Association and National Electrical Manufacturers Association. (Coll, A)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/19/19. Added attorney Nathaniel H. Nesbitt, PHV for American Lighting Association and National Electrical Manufacturers Association. (Coll, A)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Energy Commission, Karen Douglas, David Hochschild, J. Andrew McAllister, Patty Monahan, Janea A. Scott* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michelle Roberts Gonzales* *Hogan Lovells US LLP* *1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 1400* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Benson, A.)
December 16, 2019 PAYMENT for #5 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8623247. (Gonzales, Michelle)
December 16, 2019 PAYMENT for #4 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8623235. (Gonzales, Michelle)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by American Lighting Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association for attorney Nathaniel H. Nesbitt to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Roberts, Michelle)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by American Lighting Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association for attorney Sean M. Marotta to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Roberts, Michelle)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff American Lighting Association. (Roberts, Michelle)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff National Electrical Manufacturers Association. (Roberts, Michelle)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by National Electrical Manufacturers Association, American Lighting Association. (Filing Fee $400, receipt number 0972-8623214.) Attorney Roberts, Michelle L. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Electrical Manufacturers Assoc. et al v. CA Energy Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Energy Commission
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Douglas
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Andrew McAllister
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janea A. Scott
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Monahan
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hochschild
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Lighting Association
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Nathaniel H. Nesbitt, PHV
Represented By: Sean M. Marotta, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electrical Manufacturers Association
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Nathaniel H. Nesbitt, PHV
Represented By: Sean M. Marotta, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?