Hernandez v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Minerva Hernandez
Defendant: Blue Line FoodService Distribution, Inc. and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02513
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Minerva Hernandez. (Gruzen, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Minerva Hernandez. Attorney Gruzen, Eric Meier added. (Gruzen, Eric)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Blue Line FoodService Distribution, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. re #7 Notice - Other, #6 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Schubert, Jill)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) by Blue Line FoodService Distribution, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Schubert, Jill) Modified on 12/18/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Blue Line FoodService Distribution, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Related Case(s). (Ochs, Danielle)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Blue Line FoodService Distribution, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Ochs, Danielle)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) by Blue Line FoodService Distribution, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Ochs, Danielle)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Blue Line FoodService Distribution, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Ochs, Danielle)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, STK-CV-UWT-19-0014654 by Minerva Hernandez. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8621039) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve King, #2 Declaration of Mike Kucinski, #3 Declaration of Danielle Ochs, #4 Exhibit A-E, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ochs, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Line FoodService Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle Ochs
Represented By: Jill Leder Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle Ochs
Represented By: Jill Leder Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Hernandez
Represented By: Ruth Yvonne Gewing
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovretovich
Represented By: Eric Meier Gruzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?