Calmelet v. Board of Trustees of the CSU, et al
Plaintiff: Colette Calmelet
Defendant: Richard L. Ford, Debra S. Larson, David M. Hassenzahl and Board of Trustees of the California State University
Case Number: 2:2019cv02537
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Debra S. Larson served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (Apps, Stanley)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Board of Trustees of the California State University served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Apps, Stanley)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Richard L. Ford on 1/10/2020, Answer due 3/10/2020 (Apps, Stanley)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: David M. Hassenzahl served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (Apps, Stanley)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Board of Trustees of the California State University, Richard L. Ford, David M. Hassenzahl, Debra S. Larson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stanley Robert Apps* *Law Office of Stanley R. Apps* *3707 Poinciana Dr., No. 81* *Santa Clara, CA 95051*. (Benson, A.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Colette Calmelet (Apps, Stanley)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Colette Calmelet. Attorney Apps, Stanley Robert added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8626815) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter)(Apps, Stanley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calmelet v. Board of Trustees of the CSU, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra S. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Hassenzahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the California State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colette Calmelet
Represented By: Stanley Robert Apps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?