(PS) Charles v. U.S. Office of Personnel Management, et al.
Plaintiff: Cassandra B. Charles
Defendant: Department of Veterans, Veterans Affairs OIG, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA, Office of Regulatory Affairs, Department of Health and Human Services, Center for Disease and Control OID, Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration, Portland VA HCS, Department of the Army, Bev Cray, Department of Health and Human Services, Office of the Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Benefits Administration HCS, Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration, Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration, James A. Haley Veterans Hospital, Department of Veterans Affairs SLHCS, Department of the Army, USA Public Health Command, Department of Defense, Department of the Navy, Defense Health Agency, Health Systems Bureau, Health Resources & Services Administration, Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration, VISN4, U.S. Office of Personnel Management, Maternal and Child Health Bureau, Department of Health and Human Services, Health Resources & Service Administration and Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration, Tennessee Valley HCS
Case Number: 2:2019cv02555
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order, served on Cassandra B. Charles. (Kaminski, H)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/12/20 ORDERING that plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint that complies with the instructions given. (Kaminski, H)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to PO Box 2821, Rancho Cordova, CA 95670 by Cassandra B. Charles. (Huang, H)
January 31, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Minute Order served on Cassandra B. Charles. (Callen, V)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only). Re #4 Order to Show Cause. Because the plaintiff did file his Amended Complaint in a timely manner, the Order to show cause ECF No. 4 is hereby VACATED. (Callen, V)
January 31, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order to Show Cause, served on Cassandra B. Charles. (Huang, H)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/30/2020 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 14 days, why her failure to file an amended complaint should not result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Huang, H)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Cassandra B. Charles.(Benson, A.)
December 30, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Cassandra B. Charles. (Huang, H)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/30/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint that names defendants who are amenable to suit, and which complies with the instructions given above. If plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order, the undersigned may recommend that this action be dismissed. (Huang, H)
December 23, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Zignago, K.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Cassandra B. Charles. (Zignago, K.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Cassandra B. Charles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Charles v. U.S. Office of Personnel Management, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans, Veterans Affairs OIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services, FDA, Office of Regulatory Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services, Center for Disease and Control OID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration, Portland VA HCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bev Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services, Office of the Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Benefits Administration HCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration, James A. Haley Veterans Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs SLHCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Army, USA Public Health Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense, Department of the Navy, Defense Health Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Systems Bureau, Health Resources & Services Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration, VISN4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Office of Personnel Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maternal and Child Health Bureau, Department of Health and Human Services, Health Resources & Service Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration, Tennessee Valley HCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra B. Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?