Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest v. Daleiden et al

Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest
Defendant: Center for Medical Progress & BioMax, David Daleiden and BioMax Procurement Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019mc00002
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
0 Judge: Deborah Barnes
1 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 CASE CLOSED pursuant to #7 Notice of Withdrawal of #1 Motion to Quash. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION re #1 Motion to Quash by Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mayo, Sharon)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ONLY) signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 02/11/2019. Re #5 Opposition to Motion, the parties are reminded that this matter shall be briefed in compliance with Local Rule 251 and the undersigned's Standard Information. (Van Dine, B)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 OPPOSITION by BioMax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress & BioMax, David Daleiden to #1 Motion to Quash. Attorney LiMandri, Charles S. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Notice of Request to Seal, #3 Proof of Service)(LiMandri, Charles) Modified on 2/11/2019 (Coll, A).
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of HEARING re #1 Motion to Quash. Hearing SET for February 22, 2019, 10:00 a.m. Courtroom 27. The Honorable Deborah Barnes presiding. by Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest re . Attorney Mayo, Sharon added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mayo, Sharon)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Motion to Quash. (Bomse, Amy)
January 11, 2019 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED. (Washington, S)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest (Bomse, Amy)
January 11, 2019 PAYMENT for miscellaneous case filing fee in the amount of $ 47, receipt number 0972-8055813. (Bomse, Amy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to QUASH Subpoena by Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest. Attorney Bomse, Amy Lynne added. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Amy Bomse, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order)(Bomse, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest v. Daleiden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Medical Progress & BioMax
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Daleiden
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioMax Procurement Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?