Planned Parenthood Federation of America et al v. Center for Medical Progress & BioMax et al

Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of the Rocky Mountains, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Pasadena & San Gabriel Valley, Inc., Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc., Planned Parenthood Gulf Coast, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Planned Parenthood Orange & San Bernardino Counties, Inc., Planned Parenthood Los Angeles, Planned Parenthood Santa Barbara, Ventura & San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc. and Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest
Defendant: Troy Newman, Center for Medical Progress & BioMax, Gerardo Lopez Lopez, Albin A. Rhomberg, David Daleiden, Sandra Merritt, BioMax Procurement Services, LLC, Robert Sarkis and Susan Tennenbaum
Respondent: StemExpress, LLC and Sarah Heuston
Undetermined: Planned Parenthood Shasta-Diablo, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019mc00009
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from California Northern District case number 3:19-mc-80042. (Robles, S)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/8/19 GRANTING #6 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Transfer Motion to Compel. Defendants' Motion to Compel Document Production re Subpoena #1 shall be transferred to Northern District of California Case No. 3:16- cv-00236. (Kaminski, H)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 OPPOSITION by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax to #6 Ex Parte Application. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Jonna, #2 Proof of Service)(LiMandri, Charles) Modified on 2/12/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re #6 Ex Parte Application, by Sarah Heuston, StemExpress, LLC. (Einsohn, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/12/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Transfer or to Continue Hearing on #1 Motion to Compel by StemExpress, LLC, Sarah Heuston . Attorney Einsohn, Jeffrey S. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Einsohn, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/8/2019 (Huang, H).
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only). re #1 Motion to Compel. The court is in receipt of defendants' motion to compel responses to a third party subpoena issued to StemExpress, LLC and Sarah Heuston. ECF No. 1. Upon review of the certificate of service (ECF No. 1-5) there is no indication that either StemExpress, LLC or Sarah Heuston were served in this matter. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to serve the Motion to Compel, accompanying exhibits, and a copy of this order on StemExpress, LLC and Sarah Heuston, and file a certificate of service no later than Tuesday, January 22, 2019. Further, it is noted that defendants incorrectly set this matter for hearing in Courtroom 25. The hearing will take place on February 27, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Callen, V)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Motion to Compel by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax. (LiMandri, Charles) Modified on 1/17/2019 (Benson, A.).
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE of MOTION HEARING re #1 Motion to Compel by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire (LiMandri, Charles) Modified on 1/17/2019 (Benson, A.).
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax re #1 Motion to Compel. (LiMandri, Charles)
January 15, 2019 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED: MOTION to COMPEL Document Production re Subpoena served on StemExpress, LLC & Sarah Heuston in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-cv-00236-WHO. (York, M)
January 15, 2019 PAYMENT for miscellaneous case filing fee in the amount of $47.00, receipt number 0972-8062134. (LiMandri, Charles)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to COMPEL Document Production re Subpoena served on StemExpress, LLC & Sarah Heuston in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-cv-00236-WHO by BioMax Procurement Services, LLC, et al.,. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of David Daleiden, #3 Declaration of Paul Jonna, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proof of Service)(LiMandri, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planned Parenthood Federation of America et al v. Center for Medical Progress & BioMax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of the Rocky Mountains
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Center for Choice
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Pasadena & San Gabriel Valley, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Gulf Coast
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Federation of America
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Orange & San Bernardino Counties, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Los Angeles
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Santa Barbara, Ventura & San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Newman
Represented By: Vladimir F. Kozina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Medical Progress & BioMax
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Lopez Lopez
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albin A. Rhomberg
Represented By: Michael D. Millen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Daleiden
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioMax Procurement Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sarkis
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Tennenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Planned Parenthood Shasta-Diablo, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: StemExpress, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Einsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sarah Heuston
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Einsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?