Planned Parenthood Federation of America et al v. Center for Medical Progress & BioMax et al

Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of the Rocky Mountains, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Pasadena & San Gabriel Valley, Inc., Planned Parenthood Shasta-Diablo, Inc., Planned Parenthood of Santa Barbara, Ventura and San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc., Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc., Planned Parenthood Gulf Coast, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Planned Parenthood Orange and San Bernardino Counties, Inc., planned parenthood pacific southwest, Planned Parenthood Northern California and Planned Parenthood Los Angeles
Defendant: David Daleiden and Center for Medical Progress & BioMax
Case Number: 2:2019mc00056
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Edmund F Brennan
2 Judge: Troy L Nunley
3 Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/17/2019 ORDERING that this case be related to case number 2:19-mc-0002-TLN-DB and that this case be reassigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings; any dates currently set in the reassigned case are VACATED. Case reassigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings. Judge William B. Shubb, Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan no longer assigned to case. (Huang, H)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (LiMandri, Charles)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER: On 3/27/2019 Defendants filed a Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Served on California Bank & Trust #1 , but has not set the motion for hearing. Counsel for Defendants is directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan to obtain available civil law and motion hearing dates. (Text only entry)(Cannarozzi, N)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax, David Daleiden re #1 Motion to Compel. (LiMandri, Charles)
March 27, 2019 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED (MOTION to COMPEL). (Kaminski, H)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to COMPEL Compliance with Subpoena Served on California Bank & Trust by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax, David Daleiden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Related Case)(LiMandri, Charles)
March 27, 2019 PAYMENT for miscellaneous case filing fee in the amount of $ 47, receipt number 0972-8181945. (LiMandri, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planned Parenthood Federation of America et al v. Center for Medical Progress & BioMax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of the Rocky Mountains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Center for Choice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Pasadena & San Gabriel Valley, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Shasta-Diablo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of Santa Barbara, Ventura and San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Gulf Coast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Federation of America
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Orange and San Bernardino Counties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: planned parenthood pacific southwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Northern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Daleiden
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Medical Progress & BioMax
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?