(PC) Easley v. Strain/Hall et al
Plaintiff: Steven Jerome Easley
Defendant: Thomas Vincent, Terri Hall, Ashley Steward, Sutter Hospital, Ricky Reed, Police Department, Tywanda Strain/Hall, USC Medical Center, Park Rangers, Jasmine Watt, Sacramento County, Dawn Hernandez, Metro PCS, Microsoft, Black Spade Organization, Lake View Terrace and Kaiser Hospital
Case Number: 2:2020cv00103
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 39 COPY of COMPLAINT ABOUT PEACE OFFICERS by Steven Jerome Easley (Benson, A.)
September 21, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE re Information Collection by Steven Jerome Easley. (Tupolo, A)
September 14, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #30 Order, Findings and Recommendations re-served on Steven Jerome Easley at 1351 North C. Street address. (Yin, K)
September 9, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 1351 North C Street c/o George Kohaummel and DECLARATION by Steven Jerome Easley. (Tupolo, A)
August 11, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER from Steven Jerome Easley re fabricated documents. (MAINTAINED ON PAPAER) (Tupolo, A)
August 5, 2020 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward: #30 Order and Findings and Recommendations, sent to Steven Jerome Easley. Notice of Change of Address due by 10/13/2020. (Huang, H)
July 30, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE re Project Room Key by Steven Jerome Easley. (Coll, A)
July 23, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER from Steven Jerome Easley re standard living conditions. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 15, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #30 Order, Findings and Recommendations re-served on Steven Jerome Easley at La Quinta Inn address with Room #134. (Yin, K)
July 14, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for an extension of time and NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 200 Jibboom Street, #134, Sacramento, CA 95811 by Steven Jerome Easley. (Becknal, R)
July 10, 2020 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, unable to forward: #30 Order sent to Steven Jerome Easley. Notice of Change of Address due by 9/17/2020. (Becknal, R)
July 6, 2020 Filing 32 REQUEST for RELIEF, REQUEST to REVIEW Medical Insurance Coverage by Steven Jerome Easley. (York, M)
June 26, 2020 Filing 31 STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Steven Jerome Easley. (Kaminski, H)
June 25, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #30 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Steven Jerome Easley. (Tupolo, A)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/25/2020 DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a District Judge. Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller added. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations. (Tupolo, A)
June 17, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE re Social Security Income by Steven Jerome Easley. (Huang, H)
June 10, 2020 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable-Not Deliverable as Addressed-Unable to Forward-RTS: #21 Order and #22 Order Directing Prisoner Payment sent to Steven Jerome Easley at: c/o Patricia Joseph, 1651 W. El Camino Ave., Apt 139, Sacramento, CA 95833. Notice of Change of Address due by 8/17/2020. (York, M)
June 9, 2020 Filing 28 REQUEST for the court to intervene re: Social Security payment due by Steven Jerome Easley. (York, M)
June 8, 2020 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable-RTS: #21 Order and #22 Order Directing Prisoner Payment sent to Steven Jerome Easley at: La Quinta Inn, 200 Jibboom Street, Sacramento, CA 95811. Notice of Change of Address due by 8/17/2020. (York, M)
May 20, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #22 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, #21 Screening Order re-served on Steven Jerome Easley at Jibboom Street (address on 5/19/20 filing). (Yin, K)
May 19, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER from Steven Jerome Easley. (York, M)
May 12, 2020 Filing 26 LETTER from Plaintiff regarding lack of resources. (Kastilahn, A)
May 11, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER from Sacramento County Sheriff's Dept regarding release of Steven Jerome Easley from the Sacramento County Main Jail on 4/3/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
May 11, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #22 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, #21 Order on Motions re-served on Steven Jerome Easley c/o Patricia Joseph 1651 W. El Camino Ave address. (Yin, K)
May 7, 2020 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable-NOT in CUSTODY-RTS: #21 and #22 Orders sent to Steven Jerome Easley at: Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center, 12500 Bruceville Road, Elk Grove, CA 95757. (York, M)
May 1, 2020 Filing 24 EMPTY ENVELOPE (placed in District Court's drop box) RECEIVED from Steven Jerome Easley. (York, M)
May 1, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #22 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and #21 Order re-served on Steven Jerome Easley to #23 Updated Address. (Henshaw, R)
April 29, 2020 Filing 23 STATUS UPDATE and NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 831 South Lake St., Los Angeles, CA 90057 by Steven Jerome Easley. (Huang, H)
April 28, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #21 Order and #22 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Steven Jerome Easley. #16 Motion to Proceed IFP and #22 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Sheriff of Sacramento County, Attention: Inmate Trust Account, 651 I Street, Sacramento, California 95814. (Henshaw, R)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/28/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Steven Jerome Easley. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/28/2020 GRANTING #16 Application to Proceed IFP; DENYING as MOOT #2 Application to Proceed IFP; DENYING without prejudice #18 Motion for Discovery; DENYING without prejudice #20 Motion for Court Date; and DISMISSING #6 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of service of this Order. (Henshaw, R)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 REQUEST for a court date within 72 hours by Steven Jerome Easley. (Reader, L)
April 7, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER from Steven Jerome Easley re personal property being seized and denied access to the Legal Law Library. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 19, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for DISCOVERY by Steven Jerome Easley. (Zignago, K.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER from Steven Jerome Easley. (Becknal, R)
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Steven Jerome Easley. (Becknal, R)
March 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE (Motion) re prison conditions by Steven Jerome Easley. (Becknal, R) Modified on 3/18/2020 (Yin, K).
March 10, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order and IFP application re-served on Steven Jerome Easley to #14 Updated Address. (Henshaw, R)
March 10, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order and copy of IFP application served on Steven Jerome Easley. (Henshaw, R)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/9/2020 DENYING as MOOT #5 Motion for Extension of Time and ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a fully completed IFP application. (Henshaw, R)
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 12500 Bruceville Road, Elk Grove, CA 95757 and REQUEST for Status by Steven Jerome Easley. (Kaminski, H) (Response sent: "The Court will notify you as soon as any action is taken in your case.") Modified on 3/11/2020 (Henshaw, R).
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT filed by Petitioner Steven Jerome Easley re #9 Supplement. (Kaminski, H)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 651 I Street Sacramento, CA 95814 by Steven Jerome Easley. (Kaminski, H)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Steven Jerome Easley re #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Kaminski, H)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT by Steven Jerome Easley re #6 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST to consider the merger of such: Pleadings for Motions on Multi-facts, Locations and Events, by Steven Jerome Easley. (Kastilahn, A)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Steven Jerome Easley.(Kastilahn, A)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by Steven Jerome Easley. (Coll, A)
January 28, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and the courts forms for an application for writ of habeas corpus and for a civil rights complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 served on Steven Jerome Easley. (Henshaw, R)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/27/2020 ORDERING Petitioner to file either a petition for writ of habeas corpus or a civil rights complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
January 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Steven Jerome Easley. (Huang, H)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Huang, H)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Steven Jerome Easley. (Huang, H)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against All Respondents by Steven Jerome Easley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Easley v. Strain/Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Jerome Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tywanda Strain/Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USC Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Rangers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro PCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Spade Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake View Terrace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?