(PC) Ardds v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Antoine L. Ardds
Defendant: Mark Villareal, Kenneth Martin, M. Caskey, S Richardson, Lungreen, Trammel, Kim Vaye, Ashaley Toler, Kieu, Bogacs and Andre Lewis
Case Number: 2:2020cv00133
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend,, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment,, served on Antoine L. Ardds at updated address. (Plummer, M)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to California State Prison, Corcoran, PO Box 3466, Corcoran, CA 93212 by Antoine L. Ardds. (York, M)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on the Director of CDCR pursuant to #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Trust Account of Antoine L. Ardds signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/4/2020. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/4/2020 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 request to proceed IFP and DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent order. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall complete and submit the Notice of Amendment with the required documents. (Yin, K)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend, #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Antoine L. Ardds. (Yin, K)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Huang, H)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Antoine L. Ardds (Reader, L)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Antoine L. Ardds, CDC P-59915 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/17/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 2/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kaminski, H)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL and EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Antoine L. Ardds. (Kaminski, H)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Antoine L. Ardds. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 1/23/2020 (Plummer, M).
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Antoine L. Ardds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Ardds v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Villareal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Caskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lungreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Vaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashaley Toler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bogacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine L. Ardds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?