(PC) Paredes v. Burton
Plaintiff: Joel Paredes
Defendant: Robert Burton
Case Number: 2:2020cv00259
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Joel Paredes. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 5, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order of Transfer and #9 Prisoner New Case Documents re-served on Joel Paredes to #10 Updated Address. (Henshaw, R)
February 4, 2020 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Joel Paredes, CDC BK-2925 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
February 4, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Joel Paredes. (Rivera, O)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Rivera, O)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-10311.
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to P.O. Box 2400, Susanville, CA 96217 by Joel Paredes. (Benson, A.)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge John F. Walter: granting #6 REQUEST to Transfer Case. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the action be transferred to the United States District Court, Eastern District of California. (see document for further details) Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 2/4/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST Court to Transfer Action to Eastern District of California filed by Plaintiff Joel Paredes. (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 2/4/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, on or before January 6, 2020, Plaintiff shall show cause, if there be any, why this Court should not transfer the action to the Eastern District of California. (see document for further details) (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 2/4/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 2/4/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Joel Paredes. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 2/4/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Joel Paredes, served on 11/18/209. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 2/4/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Joel Paredes against Defendant Robert Burton, pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. #1 CV71) (jtil). [Transferred from cacd on 2/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Paredes v. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?