Nunery v. Siemens Mobility, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dewitt Nunery
Defendant: Siemens Mobility, Inc., Aleron Group, Inc. and Acara Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00311
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/17/2020: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #7 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 7/23/2020 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY by Dewitt Nunery re #1 Notice of Removal. (Shegerian, Carney)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Carter Lee Norfleet for Siemens Mobility, Inc., attorney Monique Gail Matar terminated (Poper, Nicholas)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Siemens Mobility, Inc.. (Poper, Nicholas)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Siemens Mobility, Inc. to #7 Motion to Remand,. (Poper, Nicholas)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/18/2020 CONTINUING the deadline for the Parties to meet and confer regarding Rule 16(B)/26(F) and all associated deadlines until 15 days after resolution of #7 Motion to Remand. (Coll, A)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to continue deadline for Rule 16(B)/26(F) Meeting and all other deadlines pending resolution of motion for remand by Dewitt Nunery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shegerian, Carney) Modified on 5/18/2020 (Reader, L).
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to REMAND by Dewitt Nunery. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Shegerian, Carney) Modified on 4/10/2020 (Huang, H).
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of joinder by Acara Solutions, Inc. Attorney Nelson, Robert S. added. (Nelson, Robert) Modified on 3/20/2020 (Coll, A).
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED #1 NOTICE of REMOVAL . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer)(Poper, Nicholas)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re #3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS by Siemens Mobility, Inc.. (Poper, Nicholas) Modified on 2/11/2020 (Kaminski, H).
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Siemens Mobility, Inc.. (Poper, Nicholas)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00271992 by Siemens Mobility, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8727998) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Poper, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunery v. Siemens Mobility, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina Layne Shadi
Represented By: Nicholas D. Poper
Represented By: Monique Gail Matar
Represented By: Carter Lee Norfleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleron Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acara Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert S. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewitt Nunery
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Kenner
Represented By: Carney R. Shegerian
Represented By: Anthony Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?