(PC) Fratus v. Dayson et al
Plaintiff: John Fratus
Defendant: Dayson and Vallar
Case Number: 2:2020cv00354
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 RECEIPT number #CAE200105286 $400.00 fbo John Fratus by State of California on 3/18/2020. (Coll, A)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by John Fratus. (Tupolo, A) Modified on 3/10/2020 (Plummer, M).
February 27, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on John Fratus. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-00354-TLN-DB. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP application served on John Fratus. (Henshaw, R)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/20/2020 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. (Henshaw, R)
February 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on John Fratus. (Coll, A)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *2/14/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Coll, A)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Fratus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Fratus v. Dayson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fratus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?