B.T.H. et al v. County of Modoc et al
Plaintiff: V. C. H., B. T. H. and T. J. H.
Defendant: Modoc County Correctional Officers, Supervisors, County of Modoc, Mike Poindexter and Modoc County Medical Care Providers
Case Number: 2:2020cv00566
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Baumbach, Larry)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by B. T. H.. (Baumbach, Larry)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mike Poindexter served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Baumbach, Larry)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Modoc County Medical Care Providers served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Baumbach, Larry)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Modoc County Correctional Officers, Supervisors served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Baumbach, Larry)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Modoc served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Baumbach, Larry)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/20/2020 EXTENDING the County's deadline to file a responsive pleading to the #1 Complaint to 5/14/2020. (Coll, A)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gregory Brian Thomas on behalf of County of Modoc. Attorney Thomas, Gregory Brian added. (Thomas, Gregory)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant County of Modoc to Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to Eastern District Local Rule 144(a) re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, by County of Modoc. Attorney Slater, Michael Augusto added. (Slater, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Modoc, Modoc County Correctional Officers, Supervisors, Modoc County Medical Care Providers, Mike Poindexter* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Larry L. Baumbach* *Law Offices of Larry L. Baumbach* *2531 Forest Avenue, Suite 100* *Chico, California 95928*. (Reader, L)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants by all plaintiffs. (Attachment(s) #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8793291) Attorney Baumbach, Larry L. added. (Baumbach, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.T.H. et al v. County of Modoc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modoc County Correctional Officers, Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Modoc
Represented By: Gregory Brian Thomas
Represented By: Michael Augusto Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Poindexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modoc County Medical Care Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. C. H.
Represented By: Larry L. Baumbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. T. H.
Represented By: Larry L. Baumbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. J. H.
Represented By: Larry L. Baumbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?