Higginbotham et al v. Southeast Employee Leasing Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marcelino Decierdo and Michael Higginbotham
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing Services, Inc. and Southeast Employee Leasing Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00575
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lindsay C. David on behalf of South East Personnel Leasing Services, Inc., Southeast Employee Leasing Services, Inc.. Attorney David, Lindsay C. added. (David, Lindsay)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by South East Personnel Leasing Services, Inc., Southeast Employee Leasing Services, Inc.. (Deitz, Eric)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of COMPLIANCE by South East Personnel Leasing Services, Inc., Southeast Employee Leasing Services, Inc.. (Deitz, Eric)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by South East Personnel Leasing Services, Inc., Southeast Employee Leasing Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of Interested Parties. (Deitz, Eric)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by South East Personnel Leasing Services, Inc., Southeast Employee Leasing Services, Inc.. (Deitz, Eric)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UOE-2020-425 by South East Personnel Leasing Services, Inc., Southeast Employee Leasing Services, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8796191) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather Clark, #2 Declaration Eric Deitz, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Deitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higginbotham et al v. Southeast Employee Leasing Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Richard Deitz
Represented By: Lindsay C. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Employee Leasing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Richard Deitz
Represented By: Lindsay C. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelino Decierdo
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Cody R. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Higginbotham
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Cody R. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?