Hubbard v. Service Employees International Union Local 2015 et al
Plaintiff: Tanishia Hubbard
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Betty T Yee, Service Employees International Union Local 2015 and Betty T. Yee
Case Number: 2:2020cv00670
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION for 28 day Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Service Employees International Union Local 2015. (Kronland, Scott) Modified on 5/27/2020 (Coll, A).
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra served on 4/30/2020, answer due 5/21/2020. (Gondeiro, Mariah)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Betty T. Yee served on 4/30/2020, answer due 5/21/2020. (Gondeiro, Mariah)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Betty T. Yee. Attorney O'Brien, Anthony Paul added. (O'Brien, Anthony) Modified on 5/20/2020 (Zignago, K.).
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE and ACKNOWLEDGMENT of RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint as to Service Employees International Union Local 2015 by Tanishia Hubbard. (Gondeiro, Mariah)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, Service Employees International Union Local 2015, Betty T Yee* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mariah Rose Gondeiro* *Freedom Foundation* *P.O.Box 552* *Olympia, WA 98507-0552*. (Tupolo, A)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Tanishia Hubbard. Attorney Gondeiro, Mariah Rose added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8820095) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gondeiro, Mariah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard v. Service Employees International Union Local 2015 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty T Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union Local 2015
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty T. Yee
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanishia Hubbard
Represented By: Shella Sadovnik
Represented By: Mariah Rose Gondeiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?