(PC) Brownlee v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Justin Brownlee
Defendant: T. Purnell, B. Berneiser, J. Heister, R. Singh, M. Martel, A. Schmidt, M. Gines, S. Lee, J. Medeiros, J. Soria and M. Shoffner
Case Number: 2:2020cv00696
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-00696 JAM KJN (PC). (Becknal, R)
April 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Becknal, R)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Becknal, R)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 DOCUMENTS SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Order, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on CSP Corcoran. (Jessen, A)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/1/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 E-Filing Notice, #2 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/3/2020. New Case Number 2:20-cv-00696-KJN (PC). Old Case Number 1:20-cv-00469-BAM (PC). (Jessen, A)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Jessen, A)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against B. Berneiser, M. Gines, J. Heister, S. Lee, M. Martel, J. Medeiros, T. Purnell, A. Schmidt, M. Shoffner, R. Singh, J. Soria by Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Brownlee v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Berneiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Heister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Soria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Shoffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Justin Brownlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?