(PS) Kuneman v. Prouty et al
Plaintiff: William Alan Kuneman
Defendant: David T. Ludington, Donna J. Peter and Douglas M. Prouty
Case Number: 2:2020cv00709
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Donna J. Peter served on 5/14/2020. (Kaminski, H)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by William Alan Kuneman to #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (Kaminski, H)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/26/2020 VACATING the 8/5/2020 Initial Scheduling Conference pending resolution of #6 & #8 Motions to Dismiss. (Coll, A)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by William Alan Kuneman. (Kaminski, H)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Douglas M. Prouty served on 4/14/2020. (Kaminski, H)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 OPPOSITION by William Alan Kuneman to #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Kaminski, H)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by David T. Ludington. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Vinding, Michael) Modified on 5/20/2020 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Vinding, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Douglas M. Prouty. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Redding before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Nagle, Sharon) Modified on 5/4/2020 (Kaminski, H).
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Nagle, Sharon)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 8, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Civil New Case Documents for KJM, #2 Summons served on William Alan Kuneman. (Benson, A.)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Benson, A.)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *David T. Ludington, Donna J. Peter, Douglas M. Prouty* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William Alan Kuneman* *P.O. Box 252* *Oak Hill, FL 32759*. (Benson, A.)
April 8, 2020 RECEIPT number #CAE200105502 $400.00 fbo Kuneman v. Prouty by William A. Kuneman on 4/7/2020. (Benson, A.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by William Alan Kuneman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Kuneman v. Prouty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Alan Kuneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T. Ludington
Represented By: Michael E. Vinding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna J. Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas M. Prouty
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?