(PC)Jansen v. Sutter County
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jansen
Defendant: Sutter County
Case Number: 2:2020cv00732
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order and IFP Form served on Michael E. Jansen. (Tupolo, A)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 04/28/2020 DIRECTING the Plaintiff to complete and submit an IFP Application within 30 days from the date of this order. Clerk to send IFP Form to Plaintiff. (Tupolo, A)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 10, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael E. Jansen. (Reader, L)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Reader, L)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael E. Jansen. (Reader, L)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Sutter County by Michael E. Jansen.(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Jansen v. Sutter County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?