(PC) Reyes v. Matteson et al
Plaintiff: Braulio Ulises Reyes
Defendant: Lisa McGhee and Giselle Matteson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00815
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order on Motion for Extension served on Braulio Ulises Reyes. (Plummer, M)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/11/20 GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 60 days from the date this order is served to file his amended complaint. (Plummer, M) Modified on 6/17/2020 (Plummer, M).
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Amended Complaint by Braulio Ulises Reyes. (Huang, H) Modified on 6/8/2020 (Plummer, M).
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
May 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and #10 Order served on Braulio Ulises Reyes. (Henshaw, R)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/5/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Braulio Ulises Reyes. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/5/2020 DENYING without prejudice #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; and DISMISSING #1 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Huang, H)
April 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Braulio Ulises Reyes. (Sant Agata, S)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sant Agata, S)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01905.
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/7/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/21/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Braulio Ulises Reyes. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/21/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Braulio Ulises Reyes. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/21/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/21/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Braulio Ulises Reyes. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/21/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Giselle Matteson, Lisa McGhee. Filed byBraulio Ulises Reyes. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Reyes v. Matteson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa McGhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giselle Matteson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braulio Ulises Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?