Caudel v. Amazon.Com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amanda Caudel
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00848
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/28/2020 ADDING Attorney Spencer Sheehan, PHV for Amazon.Com, Inc. (Kastilahn, A)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/28/2020 ADDING Attorney Carlos F. Ramirez, PHV for Amanda Caudel. (Kastilahn, A)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amanda Caudel for attorney Spencer Sheehan to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8908713) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Granade, George)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amanda Caudel for attorney Carlos F. Ramirez to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8908653) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Granade, George)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by George Volney Granade, II on behalf of Amanda Caudel. Attorney Granade, George Volney added. (Granade, George)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Amazon.Com, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Reese* *Reese Richman LLP* *875 Avenue of the Americas, 18th Floor* *New York, NY 10001*. (Benson, A.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc. by Amanda Caudel. Attorney Reese, Michael added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8861785) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reese, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caudel v. Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Caudel
Represented By: Michael Reese
Represented By: Carlos F. Ramirez, PHV
Represented By: George Volney Granade, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?