Hopson v. N and D Restaurants, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hopson
Defendant: Rouse Properties TRS, Inc., N and D Restaurants, LLC and N and D Restaurants, LLC Doing business as The Olive Garden Italian Restaurant # 1582
Case Number: 2:2020cv00915
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: The court has been advised by counsel that this action has been settled, Therefore, it is not necessary that the action remain upon the court's active calendar. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: 1. That counsel file settlement/dismissal documents, in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, no later than August 21, 2020; and 2. That any hearing dates previously set in this matter are vacated.(TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT with Request for Sixty (60) days to file Dismissal Documents by Cynthia Hopson. Dispositional Docs due by 8/24/2020. (Malakauskas, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Rouse Properties TRS, Inc. Attorney Anderson, James C. added. (Anderson, James) Modified on 5/22/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 16, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Malakauskas, Daniel)
May 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Rouse Properties TRS, Inc. served on 5/8/2020. (Malakauskas, Daniel) Modified on 5/11/2020 (Kaminski, H).
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *N and D Restaurants, LLC, Rouse Properties TRS, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel Joseph Malakauskas* *Malakauskas Law Firm* *7345 South Durango Dr., Suite B-107-240* *Las Vegas, NV 89113*. (Benson, A.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Cynthia Hopson. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8875240) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malakauskas, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. N and D Restaurants, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rouse Properties TRS, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N and D Restaurants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N and D Restaurants, LLC Doing business as The Olive Garden Italian Restaurant # 1582
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hopson
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Malakauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?