(PC)Cooper v. Shell et al
Plaintiff: Justin M. Cooper
Defendant: Cory Shell, Stephanie Maroun, Paul Gomez and S. Lueras
Case Number: 2:2020cv01014
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #7 by Plaintiff Justin M. Cooper. (Kaminski, H)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kaminski, H)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
May 26, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order and Findings and Recommendations and #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Justin M. Cooper. (Henshaw, R)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/26/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Justin M. Cooper. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/26/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDERING Clerk to assign a district judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING #1 Complaint be dismissed without prejudice, and this action be terminated. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 30 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-1014 JAM KJN (PC). (Henshaw, R)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Justin M. Cooper. (Tupolo, A)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Justin M. Cooper, CDC AZ-2405 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
May 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Justin M. Cooper. (Reader, L)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Reader, L)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Justin M. Cooper. (Reader, L)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Paul Gomez, S. Lueras, Stephanie Maroun, Cory Shell by Justin M. Cooper.(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Cooper v. Shell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Maroun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lueras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin M. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?