(PC) Harris v. Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Darren Harris
Defendant: Ralph Diaz, Gavin Newsom and Daniel E. Cueva
Case Number: 2:2020cv01031
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/15/202 GRANTING #2 and #6 Motions to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Darren Harris. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Darren Harris. (Henshaw, R)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Darren Harris. (Kaminski, H)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Becknal, R)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Darren Harris. (Tupolo, A)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Darren Harris, CDCR# J-12467 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/20/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (York, M)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Darren Harris. (York, M)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Darren Harris. (York, M)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Darren Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Harris v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel E. Cueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?