Ferrucci et al v. Bank of America, NA et al
Plaintiff: Betsy P. Ferrucci and Perry J. Ferrucci
Defendant: Bank of America, NA, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01043
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/16/2020. Added attorney Daniel Zemel, PHV for Betsy P. Ferrucci and Perry J. Ferrucci. (Coll, A)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Betsy P. Ferrucci, Perry J. Ferrucci for attorney Daniel Zemel to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8942610) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Benedict, Amanda)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bank of America, NA, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda Fay Benedict* *Law Office of Amanda Benedict* *7710 Hazard Center Dr., Suite E104* *San Diego, CA 92108*. (Benson, A.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Perry J Ferrucci, Betsy P Ferrucci. Attorney Benedict, Amanda Fay added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8902216) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benedict, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrucci et al v. Bank of America, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy P. Ferrucci
Represented By: Amanda Fay Benedict
Represented By: Daniel Zemel, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry J. Ferrucci
Represented By: Amanda Fay Benedict
Represented By: Daniel Zemel, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?