National Loan Acquisitions Company v. Niswonger et al
Plaintiff: National Loan Acquisitions Company
Defendant: Brenda Niswonger and Jerome W.H. Niswonger
Case Number: 2:2020cv01113
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/28/2020 ORDERING #11 Motion to Dismiss Hearing CONTINUTED to 9/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Any Opposition to the Motion shall be filed and served not less than 14 days preceding the Continued Hearing Date. Any Reply to the Opposition shall be filed and served not less than 7 days preceding the Continued Hearing Date. (Reader, L)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/27/2020 CONTINUING the #10 Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 9/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller with any Opposition due by 8/21/2020 and any Reply due by 8/28/2020. (Coll, A)
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to continue hearing on #11 Motion to Dismiss by National Loan Acquisitions Company. (Kraft, Douglas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to continue hearing on #10 Motion to Dismiss by National Loan Acquisitions Company. (Kraft, Douglas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The proposed Substitutions of Attorney filed at ECF Nos. #12 and #13 are GRANTED. Accordingly, Attorney Joshua Borger with the firm of Berliner Cohen, LLP, is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for Defendants, Jerome W.H. Niswonger and Brenda Niswonger, in place of Attorney Chris Boscia with the firm of Boscia Legal. In light of this Minute Order granting the Defendant's proposed Substitutions of Attorney, the proposed Substitution of Attorney filed at ECF No. #14 is DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Borger, Joshua)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Brenda Niswonger, Jerome W.H. Niswonger. (Borger, Joshua)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Brenda Niswonger. (Borger, Joshua)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Jerome W.H. Niswonger. (Borger, Joshua)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS by Brenda Niswonger, Jerome W.H. Niswonger. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Jerome W.H Niswonger)(Borger, Joshua) Modified on 6/30/2020 (Coll, A).
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS by Brenda Niswonger, Jerome W.H. Niswonger. Attorney Borger, Joshua J. added. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Borger, Joshua) Modified on 6/30/2020 (Coll, A).
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by National Loan Acquisitions Company re 8 Minute Order and 7 Minute Order. (Kraft, Douglas) Modified on 6/29/2020 (Coll, A).
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy Clerk C. Pine for Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota: This matter is set for an Initial Scheduling Conference on 10/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Redding before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this minute order on defendants not yet appearing. (Pine, C)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ORDERING this matter REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for pretrial scheduling. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/8/2020 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED, and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this minute order on Defendants not yet appearing. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Brenda Niswonger and Jerome W.H. Niswonger served on 6/6/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Kraft, Douglas) Modified on 6/9/2020 (Zignago, K.).
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Brenda Niswonger, Jerome W.H. Niswonger* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Douglas H. Kraft* *Kraft Law* *11335 Gold Express Dr., Suite 125* *Gold River, CA 95670*. (Benson, A.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION: DISREGARD re #2 Summons. Issued in error. (Benson, A.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 [DISREGARD - ISSUED IN ERROR - SEE #4 ] SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Brenda Niswonger, Jerome W.H. Niswonger* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Douglas H. Kraft* *Kraft Law* *11335 Gold Express Dr., Suite 125* *Gold River, CA 95670*. (Benson, A.) Modified on 6/3/2020 (Benson, A.).
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by National Loan Acquisitions Company. Attorney Kraft, Douglas H. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8918825) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kraft, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Loan Acquisitions Company v. Niswonger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Niswonger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome W.H. Niswonger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Loan Acquisitions Company
Represented By: Douglas H. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?